Mizdrak, Nikolina (CPSO#: 77604)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Serbian

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
West Wing 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5888 Ext. 4
Fax: (416) 603-5448
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nikolina Mizdrak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mizdrak ( CPSO# 77604 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
West Wing 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIKOLINA MIZDRAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIZDRAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004