Mizera, Barbara (CPSO#: 67249)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jun 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997