Mizgala, Cynthia Louise (CPSO#: 57465)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1996