Mizgala, Liane Mary (CPSO#: 55956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Commonwealth Healthcare Corporation
PO Box 500409
Saipan MP  96950
United States
Phone: (670) 234-8950

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Micronesia
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIANE MARY MIZGALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIZGALA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986