Mizrahi, Romina (CPSO#: 80544)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Aug 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PET Centre
CAMH College Street Site
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34508
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Romina Mizrahi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mizrahi ( CPSO# 80544 )

Business Address:
PET Centre
CAMH College Street Site
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 Aug 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2004 to 31 May 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Jul 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Romina Mizrahi may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Psychiatry,  University  of  Toronto, in which Dr. Mizrahi holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Mizrahi no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.