Mnyusiwalla, Anisa (CPSO#: 81047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
KARMA Clinic
Suite 400
18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone: (519) 570-3660
Fax: (519) 745-2509
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
Medical Imaging Dept.
Kitchener, Ontario
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4262
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anisa Mnyusiwalla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mnyusiwalla ( CPSO# 81047 )

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Business Address:
KARMA Clinic
Suite 400
18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone Number: (519) 570-3660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 Jul 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANISA MNYUSIWALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MNYUSIWALLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2010