Mo, Anita Betsy (CPSO#: 75048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: Wong, Anita Betsy (used until: 01 Oct 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 140
1780 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 2W2
Phone: (416) 286-3830
Fax: (416) 286-3133
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anita Mo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mo ( CPSO# 75048 )

Business Address:
140 - 1780 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 286-3830

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANITA BETSY MO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005