Moammer, Gemah Mohamed Abdoannabi (CPSO#: 76755)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Tahady University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 9
450 Westheights Drive
Kitchener ON  N2N 2B9
Phone: (519) 745-8279
Fax: (519) 745-5062
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gemah Moammer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Moammer ( CPSO# 76755 )

Business Address:
9 - 450 Westheights Drive
Kitchener ON  N2N 2B9
Phone Number: (519) 745-8279

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEMAH MOHAMED ABDOANNABI MOAMMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOAMMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2006