Mobeireek, Abdullah Fahad (CPSO#: 56017)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988