Mocarski, Eva Janine Marie (CPSO#: 55708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 864-5241
Fax: (416) 864-5144
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVA JANINE MARIE MOCARSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOCARSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1987