Modi, Eesh (CPSO#: 69347)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 10 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 May 2005