Modi, Thankamma (CPSO#: 32908)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Malayalam

Education:University of Cologne, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Feb 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014