Modi, Vishal (CPSO#: 99919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Feb 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 6
1750 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5H5
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Modi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 1 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Missouri

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Feb 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 24 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 24 Feb 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Vishal Modi may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only. 

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 14, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)