Moe, Orson Willy (CPSO#: 51451)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: University of Texas South Western Medical Center 5323 Harry Hines Boulevard Dallas, Texas 75390-8885
Date Received: 04 Aug 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2010