Moens, Francois Oscar Pierre (CPSO#: 42814)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Flemish, French

Education:Ghent University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Juravinski Cancer Centre at Hamilton Health Sciences 699 Concession Street Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Date Received: 18 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 18 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 31 Dec 1982
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017