Moffat, Kenneth Pryce (CPSO#: 30145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 350
345 23rd Avenue North
Nashville TN  37203
United States
Phone: (615) 983-6000 Ext. Ext 7423
Fax: (615) 983-6010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Alabama
USA - Kentucky
USA - Tennessee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH PRYCE MOFFAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOFFAT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Dec 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983