Moffat, Robert Cameron (CPSO#: 21100)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015