Moffatt, Josiah Bartholomew (CPSO#: 68134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8 Heintzman Street
Toronto ON  M6P 2J6
Phone: (416) 604-8004
Fax: (416) 604-2947
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-7302
Fax: 416-323-6094
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Moffatt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Moffatt ( CPSO# 68134 )

Business Address:
8 Heintzman Street
Toronto ON  M6P 2J6
Phone Number: (416) 604-8004

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-7302

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSIAH BARTHOLOMEW MOFFATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOFFATT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998