Moffatt, Michael Harold (CPSO#: 67121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6584
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.H. Moffatt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Moffatt ( CPSO# 67121 )

Business Address:
Saint Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Emergency Room
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6004

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL HAROLD MOFFATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOFFATT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1995