Moga, Rebecca Ann (CPSO#: 86599)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: Chauvin, Rebecca Ann (used until: 08 Jun 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Fax: (416) 603-6494
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2M9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moga Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Moga ( CPSO# 86599 )

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1

Business Address:
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2M9

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA ANN MOGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOGA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012