Moghul, Hira (CPSO#: 111686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  22 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PEAP - Resident as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HIRA MOGHUL may practise medicine only:

(a) in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the University of Toronto to which the holder is appointed, and only as part of a system in which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the program to that clinical teaching unit;

(b) to the extent required to complete the Pre-entry Assessment Program to which the holder is appointed; and

(c) under a level of supervision that is determined to be appropriate for the holder and the program of medical education and assessment, by a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario designated by the director of the program.

(2) Dr. MOGHUL may not charge a fee for medical services.

(3) This certificate expires when Dr. MOGHUL is no longer enrolled in the Pre-entry Assessment Program specified in paragraph (1), which may be no more than twelve weeks in duration.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 Jul 2018 and expires on 22 Sep 2018, or when Dr. MOGHUL's enrolment in the Pre-entry Assessment Program ends, whichever occurs first.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2017 to 14 May 2017
PEAP - Resident - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 22 Sep 2018
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 May 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018