Mohamed Ally, Shamshaad Banu (CPSO#: 87849)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: 519 464 4400
Fax: 519 464 4400
Electoral District: 01

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record may fax their request to the attention of Ms. Kirstin Kurian at Alpha IT: Fax 416 449 8543 or call 416 449 2100
Date Received: 15 Dec 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

South Africa

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAMSHAAD BANU MOHAMED ALLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED ALLY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2008