Mohamed, Amina M M (CPSO#: 84111)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Garyounis University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 17 Jul 2006
PEAP - Resident - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 18 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011