Mohamed, Curtis Randall (CPSO#: 63054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Apr 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vernon Jubilee Hospital
2101 - 32nd Street
department of medical imaging
Vernon BC  V1T 5L2
Phone: (250) 558-1264

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CURTIS RANDALL MOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jan 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1992