Mohamed, Hisham Abdelmoneim Mohamed (CPSO#: 113564)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 15 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Division of Paediatric Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HISHAM ABDELMONEIM MOHAMED MOHAMED may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MOHAMED is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. MOHAMED shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MOHAMED is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MOHAMED shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. MOHAMED ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. MOHAMED ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 21 Jul 2017 to 14 Sep 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Surgery

University of Ottawa, 15 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2017