Mohamed, Ismail Sidky (CPSO#: 80132)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alexandria, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 19 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2006