Mohamed, John Kenneth (CPSO#: 18101)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. A. Aziz 955 Queen Street East Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2C3
Date Received: 30 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 05 Dec 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Apr 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015