Mohamed, Mohamed Imamdeen (CPSO#: 25230)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
855 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 3Z1
Phone: (416) 466-9908
Fax: (416) 466-1394
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 27 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 27 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]



            As from 12:01 a.m., June 27, 2017, by order of the Quality Assurance Committee
            of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Mohamed Imamdeen Mohamed:

                  i)    Within 20 days of the date of this Order, Dr. Mohamed must obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor ("Clinical Supervisor") who is acceptable to
                        the College, who has signed an undertaking in the form attached
                        hereto as Appendix "1".  For a period of a eight (8) weeks after he
                        has obtained a Clinical Supervisor, Dr. Mohamed may only practise
                        under high-level supervision with the Clinical Supervisor
                        ("high-level supervision").  For the duration of the period of
                        high-level supervision, the Clinical Supervisor shall be the Most
                        Responsible Physician ("MRP"), as that term is defined in the
                        Guidelines for College-Directed Supervision, for all patients cared
                        for by Dr. Mohamed, and must be physically present in the room with
                        Dr. Mohamed at all times while Dr. Mohamed is engaged in patient
                        care and/or treatment.  The Clinical Supervisor shall submit weekly
                        written reports to the College.
                  
                  ii)   If Dr. Mohamed is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor as set out
                        in (i) above, Dr. Mohamed must cease practising medicine
                        immediately until such time as he has obtained a Clinical
                        Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: June 22, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)