Mohamed, Nashila Nurali Issa (CPSO#: 69638)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:Aga Khan University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 34567
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jul 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASHILA NURALI ISSA MOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1995