Mohamed Ouda, Wagih Ouda Ahmed (CPSO#: 87723)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 23 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2007