Mohamed, Sarab Hameed (CPSO#: 94465)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Hospital
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73624
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarab Mohamed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 3 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAB HAMEED MOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2012