Mohammad, Masoud Hassan Jawad (CPSO#: 69666)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 29 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 29 Sep 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 29 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 29 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001