Mohammad, Naveed Sajjad (CPSO#: 62248)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke Urgent Care Clinic
Unit 10
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6N5
Phone: (416) 741-2273
Fax: (416) 741-3542
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N.S. Mohammad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mohammad ( CPSO# 62248 )

Business Address:
Unit 10
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6N5
Phone Number: (416) 741-2273

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVEED SAJJAD MOHAMMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMAD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1992