Mohammad, Reem A M AA (CPSO#: 83619)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 10 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 11 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 10 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 11 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 11 Nov 2008
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Nov 2008