Mohammadi, Ehsan (CPSO#: 70514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospitals
750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 5420
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ehsan Mohammadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Mohammadi ( CPSO# 70514 )

Business Address:
750 Great Northen Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EHSAN MOHAMMADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMADI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998