Mohammadi, Lida (CPSO#: 84809)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Shiraz University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glazier Medical Centre
Department of Family Medicine
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1212 Ext. 205
Fax: 2897312045
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lida Mohammadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mohammadi ( CPSO# 84809 )

Business Address:
Glazier Medical Centre
Department of Family Medicine
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 579-1212

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIDA MOHAMMADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 18 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 19 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008