Mohammadi, Mitra (CPSO#: 100326)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Isfahan University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11685 Yonge Street,
Richmond Hill ON  L4E0K7
Phone: 9057709057
Fax: 9059170215
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mitra Mohammadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mohammadi ( CPSO# 100326)

Business Address:
11685 Yonge Street
Suite A103
York ON  L4E 0K7
Phone Number: (905) 770-9057

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MITRA MOHAMMADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMADI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015