Mohammadi, Muhammad Hanif (CPSO#: 81861)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Karachi, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 26 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2006