Mohammady, Maryam (CPSO#: 81371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Isfahan University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7191 Yonge Street
suit# 207
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C4
Phone: 9055975919
Fax: 9055975909
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 100
80 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M2N 2H5
Canada
Phone: (416) 222-0909
Fax: (416) 222-8292
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maryam Mohammady Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mohammady ( CPSO# 81371 )

Business Address:
207 - 7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  M2M 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 597-5919

Business Address:
Suite 100
80 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2N 2H4
Phone Number: (416) 222-0909

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARYAM MOHAMMADY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMADY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006