Mohammadzadeh, Gelareh (CPSO#: 74562)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing 4-439
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5679
Fax: (416) 603-5298
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gelareh Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 20 2009


Corporation Name: Gelareh Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mohammadzadeh ( CPSO# 74562 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing
4-439 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5679


Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GELAREH MOHAMMADZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMADZADEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Oct 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2006