Mohammed, Adam Hamde (CPSO#: 71669)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Eritrean

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
202-170 Queensway W
Toronto ON  L5B 3A8
Phone: (905) 281-8253
Fax: (905) 281-9873
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Mohammed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mohammed ( CPSO# 71669 )

Business Address:
214 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-6079

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 25 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM HAMDE MOHAMMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1997