Mohammed, El-Fellani Abdelrhman (CPSO#: 57686)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 06 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012