Mohammed, Naufal (CPSO#: 81754)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:Calicut University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Medicine
628 Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Wing
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44130
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Mohammed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mohammed ( CPSO# 81754 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital (628)
Department of Medicine
McMaster Wing
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAUFAL MOHAMMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2008