Mohammed, Reem Walid Ahmed (CPSO#: 86166)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 20 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 May 2007 to 17 Aug 2007
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 18 Aug 2007 to 17 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 18 Aug 2008 to 17 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 18 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 May 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012