Mohammed, Safraz (CPSO#: 90454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Unit C2214
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19607
Fax: 613-761-4249
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Safraz Mohammed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mohammed ( CPSO# 90454 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
C2214 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAFRAZ MOHAMMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMED is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2015