Mohan, Rajesh (CPSO#: 53648)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Feb 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4 Burnhamthorpe Road
Etobicoke ON  M9A 5C9
Phone: (416) 234-1987
Fax: (416) 234-8631
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rajesh Mohan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mohan ( CPSO# 53648 )

Business Address:
4 Burnhamthorpe Road
Etobicoke ON  M9A 5C9
Phone Number: (416) 234-1987

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2015
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 23 Jan 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., September 22, 2015, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Rajesh Mohan:

            (a)   In his general practice, including with respect to care provided to his
                  family practice patients, walk in patients and travel clinic patients,
                  Dr. Mohan shall not delegate controlled acts (as defined in the Regulated
                  Health Professions Act, 1991), nor shall he permit individuals who are
                  not regulated health professionals to conduct assessments, take
                  histories, or conduct physical examinations of patients.  

            (b)   Dr. Mohan shall successfully complete within three months of the date of
                  this order an educational program in medical record keeping that is
                  satisfactory to the College, and shall provide proof to the College of
                  his successful completion of the same.  

            (c)   Approximately sixteen (16) months from the date of this order, Dr. Mohan
                  shall undergo a reassessment of his general practice, including with
                  respect to care provided to his family practice patients, walk in
                  patients and travel clinic patients, by a College appointed Assessor.
                  The assessment may include review of Dr. Mohan's patient charts, direct
                  observations, and interviews with staff and/or patients.  The Assessor
                  shall report the results of the reassessment to the College.

            (d)   Dr. Mohan shall consent to sharing of information among the Assessor, the
                  College and the provider of the educational program as any of them deem
                  necessary or desirable in order to fulfill their respective obligations.

            (e)   Dr. Mohan shall inform the College of each and every location where he
                  practises, in any jurisdiction (his "Practice Location(s)") within
                  fifteen (15) days of this Order, and shall inform the College of any and
                  all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing
                  practice at that location, until the report of the reassessment of his
                  practice has been reported to the College.

            (f)   Dr. Mohan shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice
                  and patient charts by a College representative(s) for the purpose of
                  monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order.

            (g)   Dr. Mohan shall consent to the College making appropriate enquiries of
                  the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person who or institution
                  that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor
                  his compliance with this Order.

            (h)   Dr. Mohan shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with
                  implementing the terms of this Order.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Sep 2015
Summary:

 On September 22, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Mohan committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession; and in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Mohan admitted to the allegations. 
 
In February 2010, the College received information from a patient that she and her family had 
attended at Dr. Mohan’s clinic for travel medicine services, where they had been seen by a man 
whom they believed to be a physician. On returning home, they viewed Dr. Mohan’s website and 
realized that although they had received a prescription signed by “Dr. R. Mohan,” the man whom 
they had seen was not Dr. Mohan. Dr. Mohan explained to the patient that the man they had seen 
was not “licensed” to practise medicine in Ontario and had signed Dr. Mohan’s name on the 
prescription.   
 
As a result, the College began an investigation into Dr. Mohan’s practice. In December 2010, he 
ceased to employ physician assistants in his general practice, and cooperated with the 
investigation. The investigation showed that Dr. Mohan had employed two assistants in his 
general practice, neither of whom was authorized to practise medicine in Ontario.   
  
 Dr. Mohan failed to familiarize himself with his professional obligations in regard to delegation 
 and supervision of patient care and other issues arising from his employment of assistants.  
 Appropriate delegation, under College policy, requires a number of safeguards, including the 
 establishment of a physician-patient relationship, the existence of a medical directive or direct 
 order, appropriate evaluation of the delegate, informed patient consent, and quality assurance 
 steps, including appropriate supervision.   
  
 Dr. Mohan screened applicants for assistant positions, provided a period of job shadowing, and 
 subsequently reviewed care provided by his assistants after the fact. However, his supervision, 
 delegation and ongoing quality assurance were inadequate.  
  
 The following deficiencies in Dr. Mohan’s use of physician assistants were identified: 
 (a) Dr. Mohan delegated controlled acts in the absence of written medical directives or direct 
    orders, and in fact did not have written medical directives in his office; 
 (b) Dr. Mohan inappropriately had his physician assistants provide care while he was out of the 
   office, including during a period of time while he was on holiday, without ensuring that 
   another physician was on the premises and would supervise them; 
 (c) Dr. Mohan did not ensure that there was a prior physician-patient relationship between 
   himself and any patient seen by his physician assistants; 
(d) Dr. Mohan did not adequately ensure that there was informed patient consent to care being 
   provided by physician assistants in all cases;  
(e) When introducing patients to his physician assistants, Dr. Mohan did not adequately ensure 
    that patients were aware in all cases that physician assistants were not certified to practise 
    medicine in Ontario; 
 (f)  Dr. Mohan did not adequately ensure that his physician assistants and office staff introduced 
    the physician assistants appropriately to patients when he was not present; 
 (g) Dr. Mohan inappropriately permitted his physician assistants to write prescriptions and test 
    requisitions; and 
 (h) Dr. Mohan inappropriately billed the Ontario Health Insurance Plan for services provided by 
   his assistants in circumstances where it was not permitted for him to do so. 
  
 Dr. X, retained as an expert by the College, opined that Dr. Mohan failed to meet the standard of 
 practice of the profession with respect to delegation of controlled acts and appropriate 
 supervision of his staff. Dr. Mohan also failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
 profession with respect to his medical record-keeping. His patient charts failed to indicate the 
care-provider where care was provided by an assistant, and there was inadequate documentation 
of follow-up management plans. In two cases the deficiencies in medical record-keeping resulted 
in patients’ abnormal test results being missed.   
 
Dr. Y, an expert retained by Dr. Mohan, reviewed updated charts for some of the patients whose 
care had been reviewed by Dr. X. Dr. Y noted that since Dr. Mohan had moved to an electronic 
medical record-keeping system in 2013 there had been improvements, including in follow-up on 
test results and significant improvement in record-keeping. Dr. Y noted that in two cases Dr. 
Mohan should have monitored diabetes more closely and that there was overuse of broad 
templates, but overall opined that Dr. Mohan now met the standard of practice.   
 
Dr. Mohan has been subject to an Order of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee 
since February 20, 2015, which has been effective on an interim basis pending the disposition of 
the allegations against him. Among other things, Dr. Mohan’s general practice has been under 
clinical supervision. The clinical supervisor has recommended some improvements, for example 
to the management of diabetic patients and to record-keeping. The clinical supervisor has also 
identified patient charts in which he found care to be well-documented, appropriate 
investigations ordered, and appropriate referrals made. 
 
On September 22, 2015, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Mohan’s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, 
commencing from October 23, 2015 at 12:01 a.m. 
- the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Mohan’s certificate 
of registration: 
(a) In his general practice, including with respect to care provided to his family practice patients, 
   walk-in patients and travel clinic patients, Dr. Mohan shall not delegate controlled acts (as 
   defined in the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991), nor shall he permit individuals who 
   are not regulated health professionals to conduct assessments, take histories, or conduct 
   physical examinations of patients.   
(b) Dr. Mohan shall successfully complete within three months of the date of this order an 
   educational program in medical record-keeping that is satisfactory to the College, and shall 
   provide proof to the College of his successful completion of the same.   
(c) Approximately sixteen (16) months from the date of this order, Dr. Mohan shall undergo a 
   reassessment of his general practice, including with respect to care provided to his family 
   practice patients, walk-in patients and travel clinic patients, by a College-appointed Assessor.  
   The assessment may include review of Dr. Mohan’s patient charts, direct observations, and 
    interviews with staff and/or patients.  The Assessor shall report the results of the 
    reassessment to the College. 
 (d) Dr. Mohan shall consent to sharing of information among the Assessor, the College and the 
   provider of the educational program as any of them deem necessary or desirable in order to 
    fulfill their respective obligations. 
 (e) Dr. Mohan shall inform the College of each and every location where he practises, in any 
    jurisdiction (his “Practice Location(s)”) within fifteen (15) days of this Order, and shall 
    inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of 
    commencing practice at that location, until the report of the reassessment of his practice has 
    been reported to the College. 
 (f) Dr. Mohan shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient charts by 
   a College representative(s) for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with 
   the terms of this Order. 
(g) Dr. Mohan shall consent to the College making appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health 
   Insurance Plan and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in 
   order for the College to monitor his compliance with this Order. 
(h) Dr. Mohan shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing the terms 
   of this Order. 
- Dr. Mohan attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
- Dr. Mohan pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460.00, within thirty (30) days of the 
date of this Order. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): September 22, 2015

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 13, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)