Mohanna, Samy Stephane Maurice (CPSO#: 41982)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Laval University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Jan 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017