Mohiuddin, Masarrat (CPSO#: 30226)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Osmania University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Nov 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Sep 1990