Mohsenibod, Hadi (CPSO#: 83231)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2015