Moise, Maxime Gerald Andre (CPSO#: 33062)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Haiti, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Delaware

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017